CA AB2717 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to economic development, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Small Business Development Center Program: appropriation.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |