CA AB269 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 3117 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Vote by mail ballots: military or overseas voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 269 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 269 GROVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1787.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and V.A. |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 4103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |