CA AB2683 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 166 of the Penal Code, relating to contempt.
Title
Contempt: jurors.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent #17 AB2683 Cooley (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2683 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2683 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4147.). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4765.) |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |