CA AB2584 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827.8 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: wind energy co-metering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2584 NESTANDE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2584 NESTANDE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5203.) |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21). |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |