CA AB2582 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22902 to the Government Code, relating to postemployment health benefits.
Title
Public Employees' Medical and Hospital Care Act: postemployment health benefits: the San Francisco Bay
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Assembly - AB 2582 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB2582 Bonta (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2582 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB2582 Bonta (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2582 BONTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5842.). |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4257.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4851.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 22902 | New Code | See Bill Text |