CA AB2565 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1947.6 and 1952.7 to the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Rental property: electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2565 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2565 Muratsuchi By De Le (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2565 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2565 Muratsuchi By De Le (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2565 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 6395.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4721.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5352.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5157.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 6). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1947.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1952.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 20003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22511.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |