CA AB2558 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 87150 and 87151 of, and to repeal and add Section 87152 of, the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: faculty and staff development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2558 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Williams By Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2558 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2558 Williams By Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2558 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6394.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4729.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4752.) |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87152 | New Code | See Bill Text |