CA AB2551 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 908, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 908, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9401 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Local ballot measures: bond issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 2551 WILK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 Wilk By Vidak (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2551 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2551 Wilk By Vidak (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2551 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 908, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6181.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6189.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4550.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4967.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |