CA AB2533 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-19 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-19 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.031 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10133.51 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: noncontracting providers.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2533 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2533 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By PEREZ, V.M (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2533 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2533 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By PEREZ, V.M (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 5301.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (April 29). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1262.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1374.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10169.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |