CA AB2521 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6027 of the Penal Code, relating to corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections: data collection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-04 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - AB 2521 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-14SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5278.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2014-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2014-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code6027Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2521&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_bill_20140523_amended_asm_v98.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_vote_20140401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_vote_20140528_0257PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_vote_20140624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2501-2550/ab_2521_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback