CA AB2517 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7069 of the Government Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Economic development: taxation: credits: certifications.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2517 DALY Third Reading Urgency (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4996.). |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4948.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7069 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 8604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |