CA AB2500 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 9.5 (commencing with Section 17750) to Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: California Investment Trust: state

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-24 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-03-19 Referred to Com. on B. & F.
2012-02-27 Read first time.
2012-02-26 From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2012-02-24 Introduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code17750New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback