CA AB2474 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31462.05, 31462.2, 31563, 31631, 31649, 31649.6, 31653, 31781, 31781.3, 31781.31, and 31787.6 of the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement.
Title
County employees retirement: benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2474 P.E., R.& S.S. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BONTA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2474 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Bonta) By Torres (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2474 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Bonta) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2474 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2474 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Bonta) By Torres (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2474 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Bonta) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2474 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6247.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4612.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3929.). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4968.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31462.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31462.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31631 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31649 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31649.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31781 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31781.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31781.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31787.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |