CA AB2453 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 8.2 (commencing with Section 37900) to Division 13 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Paso Robles Basin Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2453 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2453 Achadjian By Monning (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2453 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2453 Achadjian By Monning (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Natural Resources and Water (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2453 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 8. Page 6104.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4467.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 5226.) |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 7). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 37900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |