CA AB243 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-08-07 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.10 (commencing with Section 53399) to Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 33459 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: infrastructure and revitalization financing districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-03 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB243 Dickinson By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - AB 243 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-07SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2014-08-07AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to the Senate.
2013-09-11AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Atkins.
2013-09-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2101.).
2013-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-19SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 12).
2013-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-05-23SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 1331.)
2013-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1).
2013-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2013-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2013-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53399New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code33459Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_243&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130605_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130206_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130605_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_bill_20130819_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_vote_20130417_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_vote_20130501_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_vote_20130509_1103AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_vote_20130612_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_243_vote_20130903_0234PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback