CA AB2372 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2025.510 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil discovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deposition transcripts: costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-07-02 - AB 2372 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2372 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - AB 2372 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2012.
2012-07-13 Approved by the Governor.
2012-07-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m.
2012-07-02 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5555.).
2012-06-28 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-06-28 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4181.).
2012-06-21 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-06-20 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2012-06-11 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-05-17 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-04-30 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-04-30 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4593.)
2012-04-25 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-04-24 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-04-23 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2012-03-15 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-02-27 Read first time.
2012-02-26 From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2012-02-24 Introduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1011.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure2025.510Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2372&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_bill_20120224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_bill_20120424_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_bill_20120611_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_bill_20120705_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_bill_20120713_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_vote_20120417_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_vote_20120430_1224PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_vote_20120619_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_vote_20120628_0944AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2351-2400/ab_2372_vote_20120702_0151PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback