CA AB2363 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 399.13 and 454.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Electricity procurement.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 2363 DAHLE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2363 Dahle By Fuller (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2363 DAHLE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2363 Dahle By Fuller (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2363 DAHLE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6290.). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4652.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5189.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |