CA AB2361 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25249.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to toxic substances.
Title
Proposition 65: enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-14 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on March 28 corrected. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25249.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |