CA AB2343 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31108, 31751.3, and 31752 of the Food and Agricultural Code, and to add Section 17581.8 to the Government Code, relating to stray animals.
Title
Stray animals: pounds and shelters: adoption of dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 31108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 31751.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 31752 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 31754 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 17581.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |