CA AB2308 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-08-19 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 3007.05 to the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners: identification cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-14 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - AB 2308 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5271.)
2014-05-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-03-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2014-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2014-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3007.05New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2308&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20140523_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20140615_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_bill_20140819_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20140401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20140528_0227PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20140624_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2301-2350/ab_2308_vote_20140814_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback