CA AB2280 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 1.87 (commencing with Section 34191.50) to Division 24 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Community Revitalization and Investment Authorities.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2280 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2280 Alejo By Lara (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2280 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2280 Alejo By Lara (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2280 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 6592.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4762.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 4838.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 30). |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 2). |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34191.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |