CA AB2260 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1090.3 to the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: officers: motor vehicle sales: prohibitions.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23321.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1090.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |