CA AB2252 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17325 to the Family Code, relating to child support.
Title
Child support payments: electronic fund transfer: qualifying accounts.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Assembly - AB 2252 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2252 John A. P (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2252 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2252 John A. P (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2252 PEREZ, J. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5805.). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4194.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4597.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 17325 | New Code | See Bill Text |