CA AB2199 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.1b of the Penal Code, relating to mandatory supervision.
Title
Mandatory supervision: costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2199 Muratsuchi By Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - AB 2199 MURATSUCHI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - AB 2199 MURATSUCHI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4412.). |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4429.) |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |