CA AB2198 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2915.3, 2915.4, 4980.393, 4980.394, 4989.21, 4989.35, 4996.27, 4996.275, 4999.37, and 4999.77 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Mental health professionals: suicide prevention training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 2198 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2198 Levine By Gaines (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2198 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2198 Levine By Gaines (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2198 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 6178.). |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4495.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 11. Page 5026.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2915.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2915.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.393 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.394 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.275 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.150 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.77 | New Code | See Bill Text |