CA AB2174 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state property, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State property: surplus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-18 - AB 2174A& A.R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2174 Committee on ACC. & ADM. REV. (Fr By Hernandez (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - AB 2174A& A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-15 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-18AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6112.).
2014-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4496.).
2014-08-05SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-04SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
2014-06-18SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2014-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2014-05-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4849.)
2014-05-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2014-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2014-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2014-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2174&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_bill_20140220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_bill_20140328_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_bill_20140602_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_bill_20140805_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_bill_20140820_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_bill_20140915_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_vote_20140409_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_vote_20140430_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_vote_20140508_1137AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_vote_20140610_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_vote_20140814_1021AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2151-2200/ab_2174_vote_20140818_0146PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback