CA AB2170 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6502 of the Government Code, relating to joint powers.
Title
Joint powers authorities: common powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 2170 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2170 Mullin By Beall (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2170 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2170 Mullin By Beall (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2170 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2170.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4423.). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 4640.) |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 2). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |