CA AB2145 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-19 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-19 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 331.1 and 366.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: community choice aggregation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2145 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2145 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 23). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 15. Page 5296.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 23). |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 331.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 366.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |