CA AB2124 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 2.96 (commencing with Section 1001.94) of Title 6 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal sentencing.
Title
Misdemeanor offenses: deferral of sentencing: pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2124 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2124 Lowenthal By Mitchell (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2124 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2124 Lowenthal By Mitchell (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2124 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6692.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 31. Page 6695.). |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4953.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 5223.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5088.) |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.94 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |