CA AB2104 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4735 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: water-efficient landscapes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2104 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2104 Gonzalez By Nielsen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Assembly - AB 2104 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2104 Gonzalez By Nielsen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Assembly - AB 2104 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 421, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6111.). |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4502.). |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-04-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 4331.) |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 26). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4735 | Amended Code | Citation Text |