CA AB2078 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 14602.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: impoundment and sale.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-03-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2014-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code14602.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback