CA AB2059 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Block.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Block.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1158 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Medical records: electronic delivery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2059 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2059 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Block. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5093.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |