CA AB2041 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4648.32 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: regional centers: behavioral health treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2041 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - AB 2041 JONES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, HUMAN S. and APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 4640.) |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4648.32 | New Code | See Bill Text |