CA AB1986 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11208.5 of, and to repeal Section 11205 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: traffic violator school program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-26 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - AB 1986 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2014-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5111.)
2014-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
2014-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2014-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2014-03-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2014-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2014-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code11202Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code11205Repealed CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code11208.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1986&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_bill_20140219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_bill_20140409_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_bill_20140421_amended_asm_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_vote_20140428_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_vote_20140514_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_vote_20140523_1114AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1951-2000/ab_1986_vote_20140626_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback