CA AB1978 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10850.4 of, and to add Section 10605.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare services.
Title
Child welfare services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1978 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1978 Jones-Sawyer By Beall (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1978 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1978 Jones-Sawyer By Beall (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1978 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 768, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 10. Page 6661.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4915.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3784.) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 5105.) |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 21). |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10601.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10605.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10850.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11155.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |