CA AB1972 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3730, 3735, and 3739 of, and to repeal Section 3735.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to respiratory care.
Title
Respiratory care practitioners.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1972 Jones (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1972 JONES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1972 JONES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4848.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3735 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3735.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3739 | Amended Code | Citation Text |