CA AB1956 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17053 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income tax: credit: qualified tuition program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 13). |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053 | New Code | See Bill Text |