CA AB1950 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 52360) to Chapter 9 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to career education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career education: Career Education Incentive Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-30 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2014-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2014-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2014-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2014-03-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2014-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2014-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code52360New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback