CA AB1900 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1346, 1346.1, 1347, and 1347.5 of the Penal Code, relating to testimony.
Title
Victims of sex crimes: testimony: video recording.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB1900 Quirk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1900 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1900 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 160, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4256.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4599.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1346 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1346.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1347 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1347.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |