CA AB1897 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2810.3 to the Labor Code, relating to private employment.
Title
Labor contracting: client liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1897 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1897 Roger Hern (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1897 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1897 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading Amend By HERNANDEZ Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1897 Roger Hern (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1897 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1897 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading Amend By HERNANDEZ Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 6682.). |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4921.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 5349.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5255.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2810.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |