CA AB1832 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 158, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 158, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22505.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Ticket sellers: equitable ticket buying process: sale or use of circumventing software.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1832 Ian Calderon (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1832 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1832 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 158, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4836.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22505.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |