CA AB1805 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14105.194 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medi-Cal: reimbursement: provider payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.194 | New Code | See Bill Text |