CA AB1783 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7522.02 of the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public employees' retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1783 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB1783 Jones-Sawyer Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1783 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB1783 Jones-Sawyer Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1783 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 724, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6720.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29). Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6726.) Assembly Rule 63 suspende |
2014-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4974.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 22). |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4700.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4735.) |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 5250.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19635 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7522.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |