CA AB1765 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 22 (commencing with Section 18900.20) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: Habitat for Humanity Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 1765 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1765 Jones-Sawyer By Cannella (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1765 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1765 Jones-Sawyer By Cannella (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 1765 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6273.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4612.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4594.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18900.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |