CA AB1751 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1771.8 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to continuing care.
Title
Continuing care retirement communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1751 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1751 Bloom By Beall (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1751 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1751 Bloom By Beall (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1751 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6399.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 4716.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5224.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5092.) |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 30). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1771.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |