CA AB1733 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 103577 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14902 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public records: fee waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1733 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1733 Quirk-Silva By DeSaulnier (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1733 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1733 Quirk-Silva By DeSaulnier (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1733 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6516.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4832.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and T. & H. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5248.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103577 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 14902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14903 | New Code | See Bill Text |