CA AB1719 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 48003 to, and to add and repeal Section 46116 of, the Education Code, relating to kindergarten.
Title
Kindergarten: evaluation and annual reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Shirley Weber [D] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1719 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1719 Weber By Liu (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1719 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1719 Weber By Liu (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1719 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 6446.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4732.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 5246.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 37202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46111 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 46114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 46116 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46117 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46118 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 46119 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48003 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 51200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8973 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |