CA AB1707 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 722, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 722, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 57004 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Water quality: scientific peer review.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Steve Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1707 WILK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Wilk By Knight (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1707 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Wilk By Knight (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1707 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 722, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6176.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4465.). |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5111.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 57004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |