CA AB1687 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4502 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 4500) of Division 4.5 of, to add the heading of Chapter 1.3 (commencing with Section 4502) to, and to add the heading of Chapter 1.6 (commencing with Section 4507) to, Division 4.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Persons with Developmental Disabilities Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1687 Conway (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1687 CONWAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1687 CONWAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4252.). |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4748.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4502 | New Code | See Bill Text |