CA AB1672 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 48273 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.
Title
Pupil attendance: truancy.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] |
Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1672 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1672 Holden By Leno (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1672 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1672 Holden By Leno (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1672 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 6658.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4893.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5291.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 26). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48273 | Amended Code | Citation Text |